Joanna Colaneri Rodriguez | Treasurer | 2018-03-31 | 2019-06-30 |
|
Ritesh Chaturbedi | Chief Operating Officer | 2018-04-22 | 2019-01-13 |
|
Samuel Ramsey | Director/Board Member | 2018-01-31 | 2018-12-31 |
|
George Awad | Director/Board Member | 2018-01-31 | 2018-12-31 | Chief Executive Officer | 2016-06-29 | 2016-08-31 | Chairman | 2016-06-29 | 2018-01-31 |
|
Jeffrey P. Baker | Chief Executive Officer | 2018-02-19 | 2018-04-17 | Chief Operating Officer | 2017-12-05 | 2018-02-19 | President | 2018-02-19 | 2018-04-17 |
|
Anthony Renzi | Director/Board Member | 2017-01-18 | 2018-02-08 | Chief Executive Officer | 2016-11-14 | 2018-02-19 | President | 2016-11-14 | 2018-02-19 |
|
Alvaro de Molina | Director/Board Member | 2012-09-09 | 2018-02-08 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2012-09-09 | 2018-02-08 |
|
Gary Tillett | Comptroller/Controller/Auditor | 2014-02-28 | 2018-02-08 | Director of Finance/CFO | 2014-02-28 | 2018-02-08 |
|
Bill J. Meurer | Director/Board Member | 2009-04-16 | 2018-02-08 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2011-10-31 | 2018-02-08 |
|
Michael M. Bhaskaran | Director/Board Member | 2017-01-18 | 2018-02-08 |
|
Vadim Perelman | Director/Board Member | 2015-12-06 | 2018-02-08 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2015-12-06 | 2018-02-08 |
|
David James Coles | Corporate Officer/Principal | 2017-05-31 | 2018-01-31 | Corporate Officer/Principal | - | - |
|
Ellyn Brown | Director/Board Member | 2009-04-16 | 2017-05-16 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2011-10-31 | 2017-05-16 |
|
Michael Tokarz | Director/Board Member | 2009-04-16 | 2017-05-16 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2011-10-31 | 2017-05-16 |
|
Steven Richard Berrard | Director/Board Member | 2010-03-09 | 2017-05-16 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2011-10-31 | 2017-05-16 |
|
Jonathan F. Pedersen | General Counsel | 2013-10-31 | 2017-03-23 | Corporate Secretary | 2013-10-31 | 2017-03-23 |
|
Mark O'Brien | Director/Board Member | 2015-11-30 | 2017-01-18 | Chief Executive Officer | 2009-04-23 | 2015-10-09 | Chairman | 2009-04-23 | 2015-11-30 |
|
Shannon E. Smith | Director/Board Member | 2009-04-16 | 2017-01-18 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2009-04-16 | 2017-01-18 |
|
James L. Pappas | Director/Board Member | 2012-09-09 | 2017-01-18 | Independent Dir/Board Member | 2012-09-09 | 2017-01-18 |
|
Neal Goldman | Director/Board Member | 2016-12-31 | - |
|
Gregory Allen Williamson | Human Resources Officer | 2014-08-31 | 2016-10-31 |
|
Sheryl L. Newman | Compliance Officer | 2015-03-31 | 2016-10-23 |
|
David C. Schneider | Chief Operating Officer | 2016-03-01 | 2016-10-11 | Corporate Officer/Principal | 2013-09-30 | 2016-03-01 |
|
Denmar Dixon | Director/Board Member | 2008-11-30 | 2016-06-29 | Chief Executive Officer | 2015-10-09 | 2016-06-29 | Chief Investment Officer | 2013-10-21 | 2015-10-09 | Corporate Officer/Principal | 2008-11-30 | 2013-10-21 | President | 2015-10-09 | 2016-06-29 |
|
Keith Anderson | Chief Operating Officer | 2012-05-31 | 2014-10-31 |
|
Charles E. Cauthen | Director/Board Member | 2011-05-16 | 2011-09-14 | Chief Operating Officer | 2009-04-29 | 2014-02-02 | Director of Finance/CFO | 2011-09-14 | 2014-02-02 | Corporate Officer/Principal | 2014-02-02 | 2014-02-28 | President | 2010-03-24 | 2014-02-02 | Head of Private Banking | 2009-04-29 | 2010-03-24 |
|
Brian Libman | Corporate Officer/Principal | 2011-09-04 | 2013-11-30 |
|
Brian F. Corey | Compliance Officer | 2012-12-31 | - |
|
Cheryl A. Collins | |
John A. Burchett | Director/Board Member | 2009-04-16 | 2010-02-04 |
|
Stuart Douglass Boyd | Chief Administrative Officer | 2009-03-31 | - | Director/Board Member | 2011-05-16 | 2011-05-16 | Human Resources Officer | 2009-03-31 | 2015-02-11 | General Counsel | 2009-04-29 | 2014-01-26 | Corporate Officer/Principal | 2009-03-31 | - | Corporate Secretary | 2009-04-29 | 2014-01-26 |
|
Kimberly Ann Perez | Comptroller/Controller/Auditor | - | - | Director of Finance/CFO | 2009-04-23 | 2011-09-14 | Investor Relations Contact | - | - | Treasurer | 2009-04-23 | 2011-09-14 |
|
Delio Michael Pulido | Human Resources Officer | 2009-04-29 | - |
|
Joseph Hunter Kelly | Corporate Officer/Principal | 1984-12-31 | - |
|
Curtis T. Witherington | Chief Operating Officer | 1971-12-31 | 2012-03-05 | Corporate Officer/Principal | 2012-03-05 | - |
|
Whitney Finch | Investor Relations Contact | 2011-10-31 | - | Public Communications Contact | - | - |
|
Glen A. Banta | Chief Tech/Sci/R&D Officer | - | - |
|
William J. Batik | Chief Tech/Sci/R&D Officer | - | - |
|
Irma N. Tavares | Corporate Officer/Principal | - | - |
|
Jason E. Harbes | Investor Relations Contact | - | - |
|